ID H0551 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 254 Effective: 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DRIVING UNDER THE INFLUENCE -- Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the installation of an ignition interlock system for certain persons who are convicted of driving under the influence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to and amends existing law to provide for the installation of an ignition interlock system for certain persons who are convicted of driving under the influence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2018 Session Law Chapter 254 Effective: 01/01/2019
2018-03-22HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-21HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-20HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-19Senateto House
2018-03-19SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-19SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 21-12-2
2018-03-16SenateRetained on calendar
2018-03-15SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-14SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-07SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2018-03-07SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-06Houseto Senate
2018-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-14-1
2018-03-02HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback