ID H0536 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - U.C. to be returned to Agricultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-02 - U.C. to be returned to Agricultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRESPASS -- Amends and adds to existing law to provide for civil trespass, criminal trespass and to limit the liability of a land owner to a trespasser.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide for civil trespass, criminal trespass and to limit the liability of a land owner to a trespasser.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | House | U.C. to be returned to Agricultural Affairs Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0536/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2018/legislation/H0536.pdf |