ID H0531 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MONUMENTS AND MEMORIALS -- Adds to existing law to provide for the protection of certain monuments and memorials.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for the protection of certain monuments and memorials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-02-15 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-15 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 44-24-2 |
2022-02-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-11 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |