ID H0522 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding safety policies and technology protection measures for digital and online library resources for K-12 students.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding safety policies and technology protection measures for digital and online library resources for K-12 students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 274 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 28-2-5 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-28 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-28 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-28 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 53-11-6 |
2020-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2020-02-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |