ID H0517 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLE RENTALS -- Adds to existing law to limit regulation of motor vehicle rentals and vehicle rental marketplaces.
Title
Adds to existing law to limit regulation of motor vehicle rentals and vehicle rental marketplaces.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2018-02-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 20-48-2 |
2018-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |