ID H0517 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide certain exceptions to governmental liability for claims based upon the acts of third parties that injure themselves or members of the public on endowment lands using any road, trail or easement, or cutting wood.
Title
Amends existing law to provide certain exceptions to governmental liability for claims based upon the acts of third parties that injure themselves or members of the public on endowment lands using any road, trail or easement, or cutting wood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-14 | House | Morse |
2014-03-14 | House | 58-7-5 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Rubel, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barrett, Burgoyne, Chew, Gannon, Kloc, Ringo, Stevenson Absent -- Barbieri, Meline, Rusche, Thompson, Wood(35) Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-14 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 63 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 7, read three times |
2014-03-14 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2014-03-12 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2014-03-12 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2014-02-19 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |