ID H0511 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to the collection of information to establish provisions relating to the responsibility of private entities in collecting and storing certain information, to provide for a right of action and damages, and to provide for the application of law.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to the collection of information to establish provisions relating to the responsibility of private entities in collecting and storing certain information, to provide for a right of action and damages, and to provide for the application of law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2014-02-26 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0511.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2014/H0511.pdf |