ID H0503 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 163 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 163 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to prescription drug orders to provide for an exception, to establish provisions relating to circumstances where a prescriber may perform certain activities for a patient with whom the prescriber does not have a prescriber-patient relationship and to establish provisions relating to unprofessional conduct.
Title
Amends existing law relating to prescription drug orders to provide for an exception, to establish provisions relating to circumstances where a prescriber may perform certain activities for a patient with whom the prescriber does not have a prescriber-patient relationship and to establish provisions relating to unprofessional conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 163 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/22 | |
2012-03-22 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-21 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-21 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-20 | To enrol | |
2012-03-19 | to House | |
2012-03-19 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-12 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-12 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-09 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-28 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-28 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-28 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-27 | to Senate | |
2012-02-27 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-27 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 64-0-6 | |
2012-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-10 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-10 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-09 | to printing | |
2012-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-09 | House intro |