ID H0501 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Veto SUSTAINED by House: Ayes 29 Nays 34 Abs/Excd 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Veto SUSTAINED by House: Ayes 29 Nays 34 Abs/Excd 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to revise a definition.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Veto SUSTAINED by House: Ayes 29 Nays 34 Abs/Excd 7 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned from Governor vetoed on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:25 a.m. on March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 24-9-2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-1-3 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |