ID H0501 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2016 Session Law Chapter 282 Effective: 03/30/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2016 Session Law Chapter 282 Effective: 03/30/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WORKER'S COMPENSATION INSURANCE - Amends existing law to revise acceptable security instruments for worker's compensation insurers.
Title
Amends existing law to revise acceptable security instruments for worker's compensation insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2016 Session Law Chapter 282 Effective: 03/30/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on March 22, 2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-17 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-16 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-16 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 -Engelking |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-02 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-02 | House | PASSED -- 70-0-0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |