ID H0498 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 189 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 189 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise a sunset date and the date when the State Controller is directed to transfer moneys in the fund to the General Fund upon sunset.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a sunset date and the date when the State Controller is directed to transfer moneys in the fund to the General Fund upon sunset.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 189 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-17 | Senate | PASSED -- 18-17-0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-21 | House | PASSED -- 49-15-6 |
2014-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2014-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |