ID H0497 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 283 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 283 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND WELFARE -- Adds to existing law to provide for yellow dots on motor vehicles that contain medical information that may be used by first responders on the scene of an accident or emergency situation.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for yellow dots on motor vehicles that contain medical information that may be used by first responders on the scene of an accident or emergency situation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 283 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 25-7-3 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 36-32-2 |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2020-02-28 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2020-02-28 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-25 | House | Retained on General Orders |
2020-02-24 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |