ID H0488 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - to Loc Gov
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - to Loc Gov
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide for a rebate of sales or use tax paid for certain aircraft repairs.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for a rebate of sales or use tax paid for certain aircraft repairs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | to Loc Gov | |
2010-02-23 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-23 | Senate intro | |
2010-02-22 | to Senate | |
2010-02-22 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-22 | Rusche & Moyle | |
2010-02-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 AYES -- Andrus, Barrett, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Boe, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chadderdon(Sims), Chavez, Chew, Clark, Collins, Crane, Cronin, Durst, Eskridge, Gibbs, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Jarvis, Killen, King, Kren, Labrador, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, Mathews, McGeachin, Moyle, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Pasley-Stuart, Patrick, Pence, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Sayler, Schaefer, Shepherd(02), Shepherd(08), Shirley, Simpson, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Takasugi, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Anderson, Ruchti Floor Sponsors | |
2010-02-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-12 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-12 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-12 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-09 | to Rev/Tax | |
2010-02-09 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-08 | to printing | |
2010-02-08 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-08 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0488.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0488.pdf |