ID H0481 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-23 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Pending: Senate Commerce and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PLUMBING AND PLUMBERS -- Amends existing law to revise certain exceptions for a certificate of competency requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise certain exceptions for a certificate of competency requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-23SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2018-02-23SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-22Houseto Senate
2018-02-22HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-22HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 46-21-2
2018-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-05HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2018-02-01HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback