ID H0471 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to Revenue & Taxation
Pending: House Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Take bill off General Orders; referred to Revenue & Taxation
Pending: House Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALES AND USE TAXES -- Amends existing law to clarify provisions regarding taxation of short-term rental marketplace transactions.
Title
Amends existing law to clarify provisions regarding taxation of short-term rental marketplace transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Take bill off General Orders; referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2022-02-07 | House | U.C. to be placed on General Orders, no objection |
2022-02-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 7, 2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |