ID H0445 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2016 Session Law Chapter 46 Effective: 03/15/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2016 Session Law Chapter 46 Effective: 03/15/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE - Changes the fiscal year 2016 appropriation to the Department of Agriculture for a net increase of $2,014,500; and authorizes one additional position.
Title
Changes the fiscal year 2016 appropriation to the Department of Agriculture for a net increase of $2,014,500; and authorizes one additional position.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2016 Session Law Chapter 46 Effective: 03/15/2016 |
2016-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a.m. on March 10, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-08 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-04 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-04 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-10 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-10 | House | PASSED -- 67-2-1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-05 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |