ID H0442 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020 Session Law Chapter 332 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020 Session Law Chapter 332 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SALES TAX -- Amends existing law to provide a sales and use tax exemption for certain agricultural aircraft, materials, and parts.
Title
Amends existing law to provide a sales and use tax exemption for certain agricultural aircraft, materials, and parts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2020 Session Law Chapter 332 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:40 p.m. on March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-6-2 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-27 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-9-2 |
2020-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |