ID H0441 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - April 4, 2014 Session Law Chapter 357 Effective: 01/01/2014 Sections 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 7; 07/01/2017 Section 6
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - April 4, 2014 Session Law Chapter 357 Effective: 01/01/2014 Sections 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 7; 07/01/2017 Section 6
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to clarify the exemption from taxation law for personal property that passed the Legislature in 2008 and 2013.
Title
Amends existing law to clarify the exemption from taxation law for personal property that passed the Legislature in 2008 and 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 65) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | April 4, 2014 Session Law Chapter 357 Effective: 01/01/2014 Sections 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 7; 07/01/2017 Section 6 |
2014-03-20 | House | Law without signature |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | to enrol |
2014-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | House | Dayley |
2014-03-20 | House | 67-2-1 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett Absent -- Malek Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 70 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 0, read three times |
2014-03-20 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2014-03-20 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2014-03-20 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2014-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Siddoway |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 26-7-2 AYES -- Bair, Bock, Brackett, Cameron, Davis, Goedde, Guthrie, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Bayer, Fulcher, Hagedorn, Lakey, Nonini, Nuxoll, Vick Absent and excused -- Buckner-Webb, McKenzie Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-18 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-18 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2014-02-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2014-02-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |