ID H0435 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2024 Session Law Chapter 21 Effective: 03/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2024 Session Law Chapter 21 Effective: 03/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
UNIFORM CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding controlled substances.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding controlled substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2024 Session Law Chapter 21 Effective: 03/11/2024 |
2024-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:05 p.m. on March 8, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-02-12 | House | to Senate |
2024-02-12 | House | Title apvd |
2024-02-12 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2024-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 12, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |