ID H0417 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2016 Session Law Chapter 90 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2016 Session Law Chapter 90 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RURAL DEVELOPMENT PARTNERSHIP ACT - Amends existing law to revise responsibilities of partnership and to provide for an annual report to the Governor; to revise board of director membership provisions; to revise cochair appointment provisions; and to remove a provision that the executive director be an exempt, full-time position within a department of the Executive Branch.
Title
Amends existing law to revise responsibilities of partnership and to provide for an annual report to the Governor; to revise board of director membership provisions; to revise cochair appointment provisions; and to remove a provision that the executive director be an exempt, full-time position within a department of the Executive Branch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2016 Session Law Chapter 90 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a.m. on March 15, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-11 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-09 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-10 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-10 | House | PASSED -- 68-1-1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-02-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2016-01-29 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |