ID H0416 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 93 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 93 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to fish and game to provide that it shall be unlawful to waste edible portions of any game animal and to provide exceptions.
Title
Amends existing law relating to fish and game to provide that it shall be unlawful to waste edible portions of any game animal and to provide exceptions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 93 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-22 | To Governor | |
2010-03-19 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-18 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-18 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-17 | To enrol | |
2010-03-16 | to House | |
2010-03-16 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2010-03-05 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-04 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-04 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-04 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-22 | to Res/Env | |
2010-02-22 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-22 | Senate intro | |
2010-02-19 | to Senate | |
2010-02-19 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-19 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 | |
2010-02-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-12 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-12 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-12 | Rpt out | |
2010-01-27 | to Res/Con | |
2010-01-27 | Rpt prt | |
2010-01-26 | to printing | |
2010-01-26 | 1st rdg | |
2010-01-26 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0416.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0416.pdf |