ID H0412 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 30 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 30 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law relating to the Idaho Grape Growers and Wine Producers Commission to revise the powers and duties of the commission; and to provide for powers associated with the promotion of Idaho grape products.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law relating to the Idaho Grape Growers and Wine Producers Commission to revise the powers and duties of the commission; and to provide for powers associated with the promotion of Idaho grape products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 30 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 02/29 | |
2012-02-29 | To Governor | |
2012-02-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-02-27 | Sp signed | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-24 | To enrol | |
2012-02-23 | to House | |
2012-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-2 | |
2012-02-13 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-02 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-02 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-01 | to Senate | |
2012-02-01 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2012-01-30 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-01-30 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-27 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-01-27 | rec d/p | |
2012-01-27 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-26 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-01-26 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-25 | to printing | |
2012-01-25 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-25 | House intro |