ID H0410 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2024 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2024 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INCOME TAXES -- Amends existing law to clarify that income earned on any Indian reservation in Idaho by enrolled tribal members who live outside the state is not subject to Idaho taxes.
Title
Amends existing law to clarify that income earned on any Indian reservation in Idaho by enrolled tribal members who live outside the state is not subject to Idaho taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2024 Session Law Chapter 2 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:40 a.m. on February 19, 2024 |
2024-02-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-02-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-02-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-02-13 | Senate | to House |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-02-01 | House | to Senate |
2024-02-01 | House | Title apvd |
2024-02-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-01-19 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |