ID H0400 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - U.C. to be returned to Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - U.C. to be returned to Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COMMERCIAL TRANSACTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise the licensing requirements for regulated lenders and payday lenders and to revise administrative and civil remedies for persons offering consumer credit.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the licensing requirements for regulated lenders and payday lenders and to revise administrative and civil remedies for persons offering consumer credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | U.C. to be returned to Business Committee |
2020-02-17 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2020-02-14 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 17, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0400/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0400.pdf |