ID H0399 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PUBLIC EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- Amends existing law to designate certain employees as police officer members, to remove a provision regarding retirement eligibility and to provide that certain employees must elect to remain under certain contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to designate certain employees as police officer members, to remove a provision regarding retirement eligibility and to provide that certain employees must elect to remain under certain contributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseReturned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
2018-03-12SenateRet’d to House
2018-03-12SenateRead third time in full -- FAILED 14-21-0
2018-03-07SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2018-02-15SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-02-14Houseto Senate
2018-02-14HouseTitle apvd
2018-02-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 43-27-0
2018-02-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Wednesday, February 14, 2018
2018-02-12HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-09HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-25HouseReported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback