ID H0391 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 03/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 03/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to delete reference to the Presidential Preference Primary.
Title
Amends existing law to delete reference to the Presidential Preference Primary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 33 Effective: 03/01/12 | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 02/29 | |
2012-02-29 | To Governor | |
2012-02-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-02-27 | Sp signed | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-24 | To enrol | |
2012-02-23 | to House | |
2012-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-23 | President voted AYE | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 16-16-2 Tie vote | |
2012-02-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-16 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-10 | to St Aff | |
2012-02-10 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-10 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-08 | to Senate | |
2012-02-08 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 56-12-2 | |
2012-02-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-06 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-06 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-06 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-20 | to St Aff | |
2012-01-20 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-19 | to printing | |
2012-01-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-19 | House intro |