ID H0390 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CITY AND COUNTY OFFICERS -- Amends existing law to authorize investigations and actions against city and county officers by the attorney general.
Title
Amends existing law to authorize investigations and actions against city and county officers by the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ret’d to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President voted NAY |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full -- FAILED 17-17-1 Tie vote |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2024-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2024-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 54-15-1 |
2024-01-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-01-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-01-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |