ID H0385 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 35 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 35 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to community colleges to revise terminology, to revise provisions relating to moneys credited to the Community College Account and to provide that the State Treasurer shall make certain disbursements and to revise provisions relating to disbursement of funds from the State Community College Account.
Title
Amends existing law relating to community colleges to revise terminology, to revise provisions relating to moneys credited to the Community College Account and to provide that the State Treasurer shall make certain disbursements and to revise provisions relating to disbursement of funds from the State Community College Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 35 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 02/29 | |
2012-02-29 | To Governor | |
2012-02-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-02-27 | Sp signed | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-24 | To enrol | |
2012-02-23 | to House | |
2012-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 32-0-2 | |
2012-02-10 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-09 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-09 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-09 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-07 | to Educ | |
2012-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-07 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-06 | to Senate | |
2012-02-06 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-06 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2012-02-03 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-03 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-20 | to Educ | |
2012-01-20 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-19 | to printing | |
2012-01-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-19 | House intro |