ID H0384 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 18, 2016 Session Law Chapter 14 Effective: 02/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-18 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 18, 2016 Session Law Chapter 14 Effective: 02/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS - SECRETARY OF STATE - Appropriates an additional $1,300,000 to the Secretary of State for fiscal year 2016.
Title
Appropriates an additional $1,300,000 to the Secretary of State for fiscal year 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 18, 2016 Session Law Chapter 14 Effective: 02/18/2016 |
2016-02-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 12, 2016 |
2016-02-12 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-02-09 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-02-08 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-08 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-02 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-02 | House | PASSED -- 66-2-2 |
2016-02-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2016-01-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 1, 2016 |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |