ID H0384 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 14 Effective: 07/01/09 Sections 2 & 3; 07/01/10 Section 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-24 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 14 Effective: 07/01/09 Sections 2 & 3; 07/01/10 Section 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise the definition of "motor fuel" to include ethanol; to correct a code reference relating to the distribution of revenues from the tax on motor fuels; and to correct a code reference relating to the distribution of revenues from the tax on special fuels.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of "motor fuel" to include ethanol; to correct a code reference relating to the distribution of revenues from the tax on motor fuels; and to correct a code reference relating to the distribution of revenues from the tax on special fuels.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-24 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 14 Effective: 07/01/09 Sections 2 & 3; 07/01/10 Section 1 | |
2010-02-22 | To Governor | |
2010-02-19 | Pres signed | |
2010-02-18 | Sp signed | |
2010-02-18 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-02-17 | To enrol | |
2010-02-16 | to House | |
2010-02-16 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-16 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-02-09 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-09 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-08 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-08 | Rpt out | |
2010-01-26 | to Loc Gov | |
2010-01-26 | 1st rdg | |
2010-01-26 | Senate intro | |
2010-01-25 | to Senate | |
2010-01-25 | Title apvd | |
2010-01-25 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2010-01-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-01-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-01-20 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-01-20 | rec d/p | |
2010-01-20 | Rpt out | |
2010-01-19 | to Rev/Tax | |
2010-01-19 | Rpt prt | |
2010-01-18 | to printing | |
2010-01-18 | 1st rdg | |
2010-01-18 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0384.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0384.pdf |