ID H0379 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2018 Session Law Chapter 28 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2018 Session Law Chapter 28 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
NONPROFIT CORPORATIONS -- Amends existing law to provide that only one incorporator of a nonprofit corporation need sign the articles of incorporation when filing with the Secretary of State.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that only one incorporator of a nonprofit corporation need sign the articles of incorporation when filing with the Secretary of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2018 Session Law Chapter 28 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-02-22 | Senate | to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-02-05 | House | to Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Title apvd |
2018-02-05 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2018-02-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2018-01-31 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |