ID H0375 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 25 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 25 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to plats and vacations to revise conditions under which a governing body may direct the county surveyor or contract with a professional land surveyor in private practice to set interior monuments for a subdivision, to provide conditions under which a substitute professional land surveyor may assume responsible charge for setting interior monuments for a subdivision and to provide conditions under which a substitute professional land surveyor is required to file a record of survey.
Title
Amends existing law relating to plats and vacations to revise conditions under which a governing body may direct the county surveyor or contract with a professional land surveyor in private practice to set interior monuments for a subdivision, to provide conditions under which a substitute professional land surveyor may assume responsible charge for setting interior monuments for a subdivision and to provide conditions under which a substitute professional land surveyor is required to file a record of survey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 25 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 02/29 | |
2012-02-29 | To Governor | |
2012-02-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-02-28 | Sp signed | |
2012-02-28 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-27 | To enrol | |
2012-02-24 | to House | |
2012-02-24 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-0-3 | |
2012-02-20 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-20 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-17 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-17 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-07 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-07 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-06 | to Senate | |
2012-02-06 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-06 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2012-02-03 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-03 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-02 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-19 | to Bus | |
2012-01-19 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-18 | to printing | |
2012-01-18 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-18 | House intro |