ID H0374 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- BUDGET STABILIZATION FUND -- Amends existing law to increase the percentage of General Fund receipts that may be in the Budget Stabilization Fund; repeals the authorization of the Economic Recovery Reserve Fund; transfers the remaining balance from the Economic Recovery Reserve Fund to the Budget Stabilization Fund; and transfers $20,000,000 from the General Fund to the Budget Stabilization Fund.
Title
Amends existing law to increase the percentage of General Fund receipts that may be in the Budget Stabilization Fund; repeals the authorization of the Economic Recovery Reserve Fund; transfers the remaining balance from the Economic Recovery Reserve Fund to the Budget Stabilization Fund; and transfers $20,000,000 from the General Fund to the Budget Stabilization Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | U.C. to be returned to Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2020-01-31 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 3, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0374/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0374.pdf |