ID H0374 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2014 Session Law Chapter 9 Effective: 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2014 Session Law Chapter 9 Effective: 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the State Income Tax to provide a net operating loss carryback limit of $50,000 to certain taxpayers and corrects language referring to the Internal Revenue Code relating to capital losses.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the State Income Tax to provide a net operating loss carryback limit of $50,000 to certain taxpayers and corrects language referring to the Internal Revenue Code relating to capital losses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 13, 2014 Session Law Chapter 9 Effective: 01/01/2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 10, 2014 |
2014-02-10 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-02-05 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-02-04 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-04 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-01-23 | House | to Senate |
2014-01-23 | House | Title apvd |
2014-01-23 | House | PASSED -- 68-0-2 |
2014-01-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-01-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-01-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-01-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |