ID H0371 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2020 Session Law Chapter 136 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2020 Session Law Chapter 136 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PERSI -- Repeals and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding police officer member status.
Title
Repeals and adds to existing law to establish provisions regarding police officer member status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2020 Session Law Chapter 136 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-05 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-06 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |