ID H0362 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2014 Session Law Chapter 16 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2014 Session Law Chapter 16 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the state Community College Account to provide that certain disbursements may be ordered by the State Board of Education.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the state Community College Account to provide that certain disbursements may be ordered by the State Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 20, 2014 Session Law Chapter 16 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 18, 2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-02-13 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-02-12 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-12 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2014-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2014-01-30 | House | PASSED -- 68-0-2 |
2014-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-01-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |