ID H0361 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2023 Session Law Chapter 302 Effective: 04/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2023 Session Law Chapter 302 Effective: 04/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPT OF WATER RESOURCES AND DEPT OF ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY -- Relates to the transfer of moneys for fiscal year 2023.
Title
Relates to the transfer of moneys for fiscal year 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 5, 2023 Session Law Chapter 302 Effective: 04/05/2023 |
2023-03-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:35 a.m. on March 30, 2023 |
2023-03-30 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-28 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2023-03-28 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 24-11-0 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-03-23 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-23 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |