ID H0354 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- PUBLIC SCHOOLS -- TEACHERS DIVISION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Public Schools Educational Support Program's Division of Teachers for fiscal year 2022 and fiscal year 2021.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Public Schools Educational Support Program's Division of Teachers for fiscal year 2022 and fiscal year 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2021-04-13 | House | Previously Read in Full -- FAILED 34-34-2 |
2021-04-13 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, April 12, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2021-04-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |