ID H0346 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 55 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DENTISTS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding compensation for members of the Idaho State Board of Dentistry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding compensation for members of the Idaho State Board of Dentistry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 12, 2018 Session Law Chapter 55 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-07HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on March 6, 2018
2018-03-06HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-05SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-05SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-02HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-01HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-02-28Senateto House
2018-02-28SenateTitle apvd
2018-02-28SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 29-1-5
2018-02-19SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-02-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
2018-02-01SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-01-31Houseto Senate
2018-01-31HouseTitle apvd
2018-01-31HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-4-0
2018-01-30HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-01-29HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-01-17HouseReported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare
2018-01-16HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback