ID H0343 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2023 Session Law Chapter 216 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2023 Session Law Chapter 216 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL COMMISSION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Public Charter School Commission for fiscal year 2024.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Public Charter School Commission for fiscal year 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2023 Session Law Chapter 216 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2023-03-28 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2023-03-27 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-3-0 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2023-03-22 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-22 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2023-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |