ID H0343 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2013 Session Law Chapter 352 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2013 Session Law Chapter 352 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules that expire on July 1, 2013, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2014, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2014, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void and of no force and effect and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that administrative rules that expire on July 1, 2013, will continue to be effective until July 1, 2014, to provide that administrative rules approved or extended by the adoption of a concurrent resolution shall be effective until July 1, 2014, or until such time as they expire, to provide that rules rejected by concurrent resolution shall be null, void and of no force and effect and to authorize agencies to amend or repeal certain rules pursuant to the Administrative Procedure Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2013 Session Law Chapter 352 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-04-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on April 5, 2013 |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-04-03 | Senate | to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-04-03 | Senate | McKenzie |
2013-04-03 | Senate | 33-0-2 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Durst, Pearce Floor Sponsor |
2013-04-03 | Senate | PASSED |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-04-03 | House | to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Title apvd |
2013-04-03 | House | Holtzclaw |
2013-04-03 | House | 62-6-2 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Luker, Malek, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Packer, Palmer, Patterson, Pence, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rusche, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Ward-Engelking, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Boyle, Gestrin, Moyle, Nielsen, Shepherd Absent and excused -- Loertscher, Perry Floor Sponsor |
2013-04-03 | House | PASSED |
2013-04-03 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 65 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 5, read three times |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-03-29 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |