ID H0334 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - April 12, 2017 Session Law Chapter 337 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - April 12, 2017 Session Law Chapter 337 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to revise a distribution from the Strategic Initiatives Program.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a distribution from the Strategic Initiatives Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | April 12, 2017 Session Law Chapter 337 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Law without signature |
2017-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:05 p.m. on March 31, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-29 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 26-8-1 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-28 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-28 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |