ID H0329 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 9, 2020 Session Law Chapter 56 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 9, 2020 Session Law Chapter 56 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATER RESOURCES -- Amends existing law to authorize the director of the Department of Water Resources to receive, file, record, or retain documents of record on media other than paper.
Title
Amends existing law to authorize the director of the Department of Water Resources to receive, file, record, or retain documents of record on media other than paper.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 9, 2020 Session Law Chapter 56 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 6, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-02 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-14 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-14 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-14 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2020-02-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |