ID H0325 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Returned from Governor vetoed on March 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

TRANSPORTATION -- Amends existing law to revise the sales tax distribution to the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Fund and to establish the Bridge Maintenance and Replacement Program Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise the sales tax distribution to the Transportation Expansion and Congestion Mitigation Fund and to establish the Bridge Maintenance and Replacement Program Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20HouseReturned from Governor vetoed on March 24, 2020
2020-03-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:15 p.m. on March 19, 2020
2020-03-19HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2020-03-19SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2020-03-19SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2020-03-19HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2020-03-19Houseto enrol
2020-03-19HouseTitle apvd
2020-03-19HousePreviously Read in Full -- PASSED 50-12-8
2020-03-19HouseRead third time in full as amended in Senate
2020-03-18HouseRead second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading
2020-03-17HouseRead first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-17HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2020-03-17HouseBills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2020-03-17HouseHouse Concurred in Senate Amendments
2020-03-17HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend Concurrence
2020-03-13HouseReferred to Transportation & Defense for concurrence recommendation
2020-03-13HouseBill Previously Held at Desk, Referred to Transportation & Defense
2020-03-12HouseReturned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk
2020-03-11Senateto House
2020-03-11SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-11SenatePASSED 24-10-1
2020-03-11SenateRetained on calendar
2020-03-11SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate
2020-03-10SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2020-03-09SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-09SenateAmendments reported printed
2020-03-09SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2020-03-09SenateAmendments ordered printed
2020-03-09SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2020-03-04SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2020-03-03SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2020-03-03SenateAmendments reported printed
2020-03-02SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2020-03-02SenateAmendments ordered printed
2020-03-02SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2020-02-26SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2020-02-04SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-03Houseto Senate
2020-02-03HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-03HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 52-18-0
2020-01-31HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 3, 2020
2020-01-30HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-01-29HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-16HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback