ID H0322 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
ELECTIONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding political party affiliation of a voter for a presidential primary election.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding political party affiliation of a voter for a presidential primary election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | U.C. to be returned to State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 27, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-01-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-01-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0322/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0322.pdf |