ID H0317 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Ret'd to W/M
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Ret'd to W/M
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to public assistance to require that the State Department of Health and Welfare or its authorized agent issue certain benefits as evenly as is practicable over the course of multiple consecutive days and to provide that the distribution period will be determined by the director after conducting community stakeholder discussions; and to provide for an identification card for certified households under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program, to provide requirements relating to such identification cards and to provide that upon request, certain persons shall present the identification card to retail food stores.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to public assistance to require that the State Department of Health and Welfare or its authorized agent issue certain benefits as evenly as is practicable over the course of multiple consecutive days and to provide that the distribution period will be determined by the director after conducting community stakeholder discussions; and to provide for an identification card for certified households under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program, to provide requirements relating to such identification cards and to provide that upon request, certain persons shall present the identification card to retail food stores.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Ret'd to W/M | |
2011-03-30 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-30 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-28 | to printing | |
2011-03-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-28 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/H0317.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/H0317.pdf |