ID H0309 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 324 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 324 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- MILLENNIUM FUND -- Appropriates, distributes and transfers a total of $9,136,200 from the Idaho Millennium Income Fund for fiscal year 2018; requires nonstate entities to sign an agreement with the state in order to receive funds; provides that certain unexpended and unencumbered moneys shall revert to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund at the end of fiscal year 2018; and provides that any remaining unexpended and unencumbered moneys in the Idaho Millennium Income Fund shall be transferred to the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund at the end of fiscal year 2018.
Title
Appropriates, distributes and transfers a total of $9,136,200 from the Idaho Millennium Income Fund for fiscal year 2018; requires nonstate entities to sign an agreement with the state in order to receive funds; provides that certain unexpended and unencumbered moneys shall revert to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund at the end of fiscal year 2018; and provides that any remaining unexpended and unencumbered moneys in the Idaho Millennium Income Fund shall be transferred to the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund at the end of fiscal year 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 324 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Law without signature |
2017-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:17 p.m. on March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-23 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-22 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-22 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |