ID H0300 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HEMP -- Adds to existing law to provide for the interstate transport of hemp and to provide for the Hemp Development Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for the interstate transport of hemp and to provide for the Hemp Development Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2019-04-11HouseHouse did not Concur in Senate Amendments
2019-04-11HouseReported out of Committee and Recommend non-concurrence
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Transportation & Defense for concurrence recommendation
2019-04-09HouseReturned from the Senate Amended
2019-04-09Senateto House
2019-04-09SenateTitle apvd
2019-04-09SenateRead third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 31-1-3
2019-04-09SenateRead in full as required)
2019-04-09SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2019-04-09SenateRead second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading
2019-04-08SenateRead first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading
2019-04-08SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-04-08SenateReported out as amended; filed for first reading
2019-04-08SenateAmendments ordered printed
2019-04-08SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-04-08SenateReported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment
2019-04-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2019-04-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-04-05Houseto Senate
2019-04-05HouseTitle apvd
2019-04-05HouseRules Suspended:
2019-04-05HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-04-03HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-04-03HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback