ID H0300 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEMP -- Adds to existing law to provide for the interstate transport of hemp and to provide for the Hemp Development Fund.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for the interstate transport of hemp and to provide for the Hemp Development Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2019-04-11 | House | House did not Concur in Senate Amendments |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported out of Committee and Recommend non-concurrence |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Transportation & Defense for concurrence recommendation |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | to House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 31-1-3 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-04-05 | House | to Senate |
2019-04-05 | House | Title apvd |
2019-04-05 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |