ID H0300 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 314 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- OFFICE OF STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION -- Appropriates $9,036,500 to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 31.25; authorizes the reappropriation of the Federal Grant Fund; authorizes the reappropriation of the Public Charter School Authorizers Fund; authorizes the reappropriation of the Higher Education Stabilization Fund; provides legislative intent regarding administrator training on teacher evaluations; and provides legislative intent regarding school improvement evaluations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $9,036,500 to the Office of the State Board of Education for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 31.25; authorizes the reappropriation of the Federal Grant Fund; authorizes the reappropriation of the Public Charter School Authorizers Fund; authorizes the reappropriation of the Higher Education Stabilization Fund; provides legislative intent regarding administrator training on teacher evaluations; and provides legislative intent regarding school improvement evaluations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 314 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:17 p.m. on March 28, 2017
2017-03-28HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-28SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-28SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-27HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-24HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-23Senateto House
2017-03-23SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-23SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 33-2-0
2017-03-23SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2017-03-23SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-22SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-21SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2017-03-21SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-03-21Houseto Senate
2017-03-21HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-21HouseRules Suspended:
2017-03-20HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-17HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback